Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 100 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5321 Week
» 20435 Month
» 323625 Year
» 1545190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75034 m/e 07/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service During 07/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/02/1968
Scrapping During 07/1968 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 898 07/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) m/e 07/1953
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
24A Accrington 4w/e 19/05/1956
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 11/08/1956
6K Rhyl 4w/e 10/08/1957
6H Bangor 8w/e 05/10/1957
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
6K Rhyl w/e 10/06/1961
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/09/1961
6K Rhyl w/e 05/05/1962
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 15/09/1962
21D Aston w/e 22/12/1962
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 10/02/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 11/07/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 19/05/1956
EXLOAN 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 10/02/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby MPD (16C) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: 42283, 47611, 48225/79, 48352, 53809, 75034. SLS/196111
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75034
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
10/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75034    

prev prev