Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 178 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1212 Week
» 23718 Month
» 326908 Year
» 1548473 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75035 on 13/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 13/08/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1967
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 13 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 899 13/08/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 13/08/1953
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
6H Bangor 4w/e 10/08/1957
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
6K Rhyl w/e 23/06/1962
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 15/09/1962
6H Bangor w/e 29/06/1963
5D Stoke w/e 04/06/1966
12E Tebay w/e 27/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 15/08/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 12E Tebay 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 22/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1959 Derby Works (Stripping) Paint shop-42378/81, 43940, 47451/583, 48611. Diesel shop-ED2, 10000/100/800, 12000/035/082, D3020, 13037, D8014. New work-0-6-0 shunters D3763/4; outside-ED7, D5001/2/6. Test House-D5005/7/8. Erecting shop-1 bay-42511I, 42610 G, 44167G, 44338I, 44535G, 44587G, 47000I, 47421I, 48006/217 G, 48370/533G, 75017I. Stripping-48654, 73038, 75035. Erecting shop-2 bay-40035I, 42533G, 42542I, 44277I, 48267I, 53808I, 48317 stripping. Erecting shop-3 bay-7 Bo-Bos (D5009-15new) 1160 H.P., 5 1-Co-Co-ls 2300 H.P. Yard-40047/680/3180/7309, 58209. SLS/195902
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
05/11/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on shed) Ex-Works on shed: D138 new, D2507, 43932, 44178, 44248/94, 44433, 47250, 47327/88, 48010/53/7, 73159, 75035. SLS/196112
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75035
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
22/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75035    

prev prev