Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 160 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 23700 Month
» 326890 Year
» 1548455 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75036 on 14/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 14/08/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/06/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 900 14/08/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 14/08/1953
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 10/06/1961
6H Bangor w/e 22/06/1963
2B Nuneaton w/e 29/06/1963
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 15/08/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1953
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 11/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
09/07/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed : D5003 (1A), 42112 (9E), 42394 (87D), 47395 (8F), 75036 (6G), 75057 (15C). SLS/196208
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75036
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
11/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75036    

prev prev