Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2059 Week
» 24565 Month
» 327755 Year
» 1549320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75037 on 14/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 14/08/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 14 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 901 14/08/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 14/08/1953
21D Aston w/e 22/12/1962
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
12E Tebay w/e 13/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 15/08/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1953
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 12E Tebay 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 12E Tebay w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
14/06/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. SLS/196107
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Ex Works on Shed) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (under repair) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75037
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75037    

prev prev