Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 681 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2020 Week
» 31518 Month
» 368364 Year
» 1589929 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75038 on 25/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 25/08/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 12 yrs , 4 mths

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 902 25/08/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 25/08/1953
6D Shrewsbury w/e 10/10/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 25/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 29/08/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1953
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   w/e 25/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003
09/07/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). SLS/196208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75038
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
Tender fitted: BR2
   
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
25/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75038    

prev prev