Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 23687 Month
» 326877 Year
» 1548442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75039 on 27/08/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 27/08/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/09/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 14 yrs , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 903 27/08/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 27/08/1953
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
1E Bletchley w/e 10/03/1962
17A Derby w/e 25/05/1963
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 21/01/1967
12E Tebay w/e 22/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 23/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 29/08/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN   w/e 23/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75039
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
23/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75039    

prev prev