Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 23687 Month
» 326877 Year
» 1548442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75040 on 02/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 02/09/1953 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 14 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 904 02/09/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford (New) on 02/09/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
17A Derby w/e 16/01/1960
15C Leicester Midland w/e 23/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
5D Stoke w/e 05/10/1963
10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 05/09/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1953
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 21/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811
31/10/1959 Cricklewood MPD has now acquired a batch of Metro-Vick diesels (D5712-9) to work the Moorgate line etc. and although allocated here some are working from Bedford (14E). The standard Class 4s 75040/1/3/4/55 have all been transferred to Leicester (15C). SLS/196003
14/06/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. SLS/196107
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75040
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
21/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75040    

prev prev