Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 936 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 24476 Month
» 327666 Year
» 1549231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75041 on 10/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 10/09/1953 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/01/1968
Scrapping During 08/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 14 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 905 10/09/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford (New) on 10/09/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
15C Leicester Midland w/e 16/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 27/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 12/09/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1953
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 27/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
31/10/1959 Cricklewood MPD has now acquired a batch of Metro-Vick diesels (D5712-9) to work the Moorgate line etc. and although allocated here some are working from Bedford (14E). The standard Class 4s 75040/1/3/4/55 have all been transferred to Leicester (15C). SLS/196003
19/09/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: D3058, D3250, D8003, 41835, 42415, 44232, 47236, 47373, 47651, 48004, 48112, 48377, 75041. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75041
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
27/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75041    

prev prev