Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5341 Week
» 20455 Month
» 323645 Year
» 1545210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75042 on 11/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 11/09/1953 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/11/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 14 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 906 11/09/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford (New) on 11/09/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
15C Leicester Midland w/e 02/05/1959
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 04/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 12/09/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1953
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 04/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/07/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196308
15/08/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41535, 75011/042/050, D2504, D2508, D2911, D3024/54/249/91; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D13, D69, D5015/28/81, D49, D72, D80/1, D91, D131/41/54/5, D5030/5. Test House: D7, D14, D47, D133/4/9; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5233-7, D7568-77 new. Diesel Shop: D6, D11, D37, D58, D90/2, D105, D5010/92/221. Paint Shop: 75012, D5220. Finishing Shop: D67/8, D79, D5008, D5204/22. Stone Pit: 44433, 48105. Foundry Row: 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 63658, 73067/090. Yard: D2, D3, D43, D59, D93, D114/5/20/49, D2221, D2902/7, D5027/76/82, D5395, ED4, ED7. As Derby is expected to cease steam repairs shortly, several engines have been sent to Crewe for repair/scrap. SLS/196309
11/09/1963 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-D2221, D2505/19, D2902/7/10, 333054/5, 13089, 13335, D3374, D3580, 12063; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D9, D59. D90, D5002/33, D5133/4/5; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D7573-77, D5233-40new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D37, D45/9, D68, D96, D111/5, D122, D149, D154/7, D165, D5025, D5400. Outside electric shop for Battery change: D75, D99. Test House: D43/4, D64, D79, D125, D3024, D5028/35/82/6, D5222, D7569/70. Paint Shop: 75042 the last steam engine to be repaired, D7568. Finishing Shop: D91, D120, D7571/2. Yard by paint shop: D2, D62, D112, D136, 33147, D148, D162, D2508, D3291, D5015, D5220, ED4. Stone Pit: D47, Pullman uM60091, uM60731/41. Foundry Row: 42094, 42500, 43845, 44094, 44465, 47278, 47581, D72. Dumped in Yard: ED6, ED7. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75042
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
04/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75042    

prev prev