Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 702 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2041 Week
» 31539 Month
» 368385 Year
» 1589950 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75044 m/e 09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service During 09/1953 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/03/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 12 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 908 09/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford (New) m/e 09/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
16A Nottingham w/e 16/01/1960
15C Leicester Midland w/e 23/01/1960
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 12/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 26/09/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1953
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
31/10/1959 Cricklewood MPD has now acquired a batch of Metro-Vick diesels (D5712-9) to work the Moorgate line etc. and although allocated here some are working from Bedford (14E). The standard Class 4s 75040/1/3/4/55 have all been transferred to Leicester (15C). SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Tender Tender fitted: BR2 number 908    
09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75044
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
12/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75044    

prev prev