Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 148 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 23688 Month
» 326878 Year
» 1548443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75045 on 28/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 28/09/1953 to Accrington (24A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/04/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 12 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 909 28/09/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington (New) on 28/09/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 08/10/1955
2B Nuneaton w/e 25/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 23/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1953
NEW 24A Accrington w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 23/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 1 bay) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
15/05/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
21/01/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D35, D79, D85, D92, D102, D113, D159, D165, D303, D5008/10/23/5. Test House: D87, D125/6, D3567, D5000/22/76/89. Paint Shop: 73068/74. Diesel Finishing Shop: D152, D5018, D5186/7. Pullman Car uM60093. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41712 G, 44394, 47471, 47597/9, 73014/40/69, 75045/60, Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D139, D2387, D2507, D2908, D3085, D5002/3, D5381, Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5188-5202 under construction, note correction of numbers from those quoted in last month's journal. Works Yard: 10000, 10201/2/3 all stored awaiting decision outside works offices, D8, D60/3, D72, D96, D110/4/8, D154, D5006/79/138, 42500, 43428, 44228 frames, 44260, ED6 an ED7 frames. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75045
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Accrington (24A)
   
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
23/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75045    

prev prev