Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75046 on 05/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 05/10/1953 to Accrington (24A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 13 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 910 05/10/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington (New) on 05/10/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
9F Heaton Mersey w/e 16/04/1966
6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/04/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 21/05/1966
5D Stoke w/e 13/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24A Accrington w/e 10/10/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (under repair) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75046
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Accrington (24A)
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
16/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75046    

prev prev