Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 143 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 23683 Month
» 326873 Year
» 1548438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75047 on 16/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 16/10/1953 to Accrington (24A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 911 16/10/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington (New) on 16/10/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
5D Stoke w/e 05/02/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 05/03/1966
6F Machynlleth w/e 16/07/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/12/1966
6D Shrewsbury w/e 21/01/1967
6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
5D Stoke w/e 10/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24A Accrington w/e 17/10/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 06/08/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75047
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Accrington (24A)
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75047    

prev prev