Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 745 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2084 Week
» 31582 Month
» 368428 Year
» 1589993 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75048 on 23/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 23/10/1953 to Accrington (24A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Scrapping During 11/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 912 23/10/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington (New) on 23/10/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/04/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 21/05/1966
10D Lostock Hall w/e 27/05/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24A Accrington w/e 24/10/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204
16/02/1968 CarnforthMPD (Out of use) Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. SLS/196803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75048
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Accrington (24A)
Tender fitted: BR2
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75048    

prev prev