Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 117 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5338 Week
» 20452 Month
» 323642 Year
» 1545207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75049 m/e 10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service During 10/1953 to Accrington (24A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 13 yrs , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 913 10/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24A Accrington (New) m/e 10/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 19/05/1956
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 11/08/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24A Accrington w/e 24/10/1953
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 05/11/1955
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 19/05/1956
EXLOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 14/07/1956
WDN   w/e 08/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/02/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D70/1, D82, D104, D116/7, D120, D138, D5013/25/7/76/85, D5144/86. Test House: D114/39, D5187. Diesel Finishing Shop: D6, D99, D5189/90/1. Paint Shop: D105 D3085, D5188. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 47447/53, 48370, 73013/45/156, 75049/51, D109, D3056, ED6, ED7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D108, D2387, D3245/372, D5075/87; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5192-D5207 new construction. Works Yard: 40031, 42306/14, 42472, 42500, 43958, 44394, 47302/4, D42, D52/8, D64, D68, D80, D96, D107, D118, D3248, D3863, D5018, ED3. Stored outside Works office: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75049
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Accrington (24A)
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
08/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75049    

prev prev