Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5332 Week
» 20446 Month
» 323636 Year
» 1545201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75051 on 27/11/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 27/11/1956 to Chester (MR) (6A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/10/1966
Scrapping During 02/1967 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1015 27/11/1956 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6A Chester (MR) (New) on 27/11/1956
6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1958
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
1E Bletchley w/e 23/06/1962
17A Derby w/e 25/05/1963
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 06/03/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 29/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1956
NEW 6A Chester (MR) w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 29/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
18/02/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D70/1, D82, D104, D116/7, D120, D138, D5013/25/7/76/85, D5144/86. Test House: D114/39, D5187. Diesel Finishing Shop: D6, D99, D5189/90/1. Paint Shop: D105 D3085, D5188. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 47447/53, 48370, 73013/45/156, 75049/51, D109, D3056, ED6, ED7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D108, D2387, D3245/372, D5075/87; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5192-D5207 new construction. Works Yard: 40031, 42306/14, 42472, 42500, 43958, 44394, 47302/4, D42, D52/8, D64, D68, D80, D96, D107, D118, D3248, D3863, D5018, ED3. Stored outside Works office: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75051
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A)
   
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
29/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75051    

prev prev