Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 148 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 23688 Month
» 326878 Year
» 1548443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75052 on 20/12/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 20/12/1956 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 10 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1016 20/12/1956 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 20/12/1956
6D Chester Northgate w/e 07/11/1959
1A Willesden w/e 09/01/1960
2B Nuneaton w/e 19/01/1963
6J Holyhead w/e 19/06/1965
6F Machynlleth w/e 16/07/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 10/12/1966
5D Stoke w/e 10/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 22/12/1956
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/12/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 06/08/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/12/1958 Rugby Works 42451(26A), 73137(15C), 75052(1E), 90576 (26A), 61853(2F), 64331(2F). SLS/195902
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
17/11/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on Shed) Ex-Works on Shed: D211, D5024, 41804, 42421, 44241, 48185, 48467, 73073, 75030/52. SLS/196112
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Ex Works) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75052
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75052    

prev prev