Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 958 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1992 Week
» 24498 Month
» 327688 Year
» 1549253 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75053 m/e 01/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service During 01/1957 to Chester (MR) (6A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/09/1966
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 9 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1017 01/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6A Chester (MR) (New) m/e 01/1957
6K Rhyl 4w/e 14/06/1958
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
6K Rhyl w/e 18/06/1960
6B Mold Junction w/e 17/09/1960
1E Bletchley w/e 05/05/1962
21D Aston w/e 22/12/1962
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 10/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 6A Chester (MR) w/e 05/01/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/01/1957
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 10/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (under repair) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75053
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
10/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75053    

prev prev