Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 100 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5321 Week
» 20435 Month
» 323625 Year
» 1545190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75054 on 17/01/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 17/01/1957 to Chester (MR) (6A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/08/1966
Scrapping During 01/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 9 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1018 17/01/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6A Chester (MR) (New) on 17/01/1957
6K Rhyl 4w/e 14/06/1958
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
6K Rhyl w/e 18/06/1960
6B Mold Junction w/e 17/09/1960
1E Bletchley w/e 05/05/1962
5D Stoke w/e 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 27/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 6A Chester (MR) w/e 19/01/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/01/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 27/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/01/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75054
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75054    

prev prev