Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 741 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2080 Week
» 31578 Month
» 368424 Year
» 1589989 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75055 on 23/01/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 23/01/1957 to Bedford (15D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/05/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 10 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1019 23/01/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15D Bedford (New) on 23/01/1957
16A Nottingham w/e 16/01/1960
15C Leicester Midland w/e 23/01/1960
16A Nottingham w/e 25/02/1961
15C Leicester Midland w/e 10/02/1962
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 25/05/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
1E Bletchley w/e 10/10/1964
6F Machynlleth w/e 19/06/1965
6D Shrewsbury w/e 10/12/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
5D Stoke w/e 13/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 27/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15D Bedford w/e 26/01/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/01/1957
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 1E Bletchley w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN   w/e 27/05/1967
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1959 Cricklewood MPD has now acquired a batch of Metro-Vick diesels (D5712-9) to work the Moorgate line etc. and although allocated here some are working from Bedford (14E). The standard Class 4s 75040/1/3/4/55 have all been transferred to Leicester (15C). SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/01/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75055
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bedford (15D)
Tender fitted: BR2A
   
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75055    

prev prev