Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 153 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1187 Week
» 23693 Month
» 326883 Year
» 1548448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75056 on 28/02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 28/02/1957 to Nottingham (16A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/06/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 9 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1020 28/02/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham (New) on 28/02/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 25/05/1963
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 16A Nottingham w/e 02/03/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 11/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, 1 bay) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903
16/11/1962 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. SLS/196212
01/02/1964 Branch line news (Works Yard) Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April.
The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964.
SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. SLS/196403
25/04/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75056
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Nottingham (16A)
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
11/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75056    

prev prev