Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5332 Week
» 20446 Month
» 323636 Year
» 1545201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75057 m/e 03/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service During 03/1957 to Leicester Midland (15C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 8 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1021 03/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15C Leicester Midland (New) m/e 03/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G Skipton w/e 06/03/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15C Leicester Midland w/e 16/03/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/03/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 Leicester (G.C.) Of the four B.R. locomotives on loan from the M.R. shed (75057/61, 73138 and 92164) only the 9F is liked, which might account for its regular use on the ' Master Cutler ' or other express. SLS/195809
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
09/07/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed : D5003 (1A), 42112 (9E), 42394 (87D), 47395 (8F), 75036 (6G), 75057 (15C). SLS/196208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75057
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C)
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75057    

prev prev