Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75058 on 08/04/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 08/04/1957 to Leicester Midland (15C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1022 08/04/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15C Leicester Midland (New) on 08/04/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/01/1964
10G Skipton w/e 06/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 08/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15C Leicester Midland w/e 13/04/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
14/06/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. SLS/196107
12/07/1961 Derby MPD (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: D5018, 42070, 42352, 42401, 43845, 44333, 44516/20, 47549, 48177, 48604, 75058. SLS/196108
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Ex Works) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75058
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C)
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75058    

prev prev