Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19291 Week
» 72307 Month
» 191834 Year
» 3218687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7506 |
27/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25156 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
20/01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
18/11/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
20/01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7506 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
20/01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25156 |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
20/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25156 |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|