Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 737 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2076 Week
» 31574 Month
» 368420 Year
» 1589985 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75062 on 28/05/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 28/05/1957
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/02/1968
Scrapping During 06/1968 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1026 28/05/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 28/05/1957
16A Nottingham 4w/e 16/06/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
5D Stoke w/e 05/10/1963
10D Lostock Hall w/e 13/05/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 10/02/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 16A Nottingham on 28/05/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/05/1957
NEW 16A Nottingham 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 10/02/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
24/07/1966 Crewe Works (Side of works) Erecting Shop: 45041/187/203/54/312, 48076/151/356/465/622, 75029, 92069/154, D223/35/56/87/91, D360, D1563/4/89/94, D1612/82/90, D1724/51/9/72, D5717, D8026/49, D1102-9. Electric shop: E3033/8/42/3/89, 26037; Adjoining Electric shop: D1500/14/8/687/715/60/813/58/88, D244, D297, D5252/7, D7584/5, 27000. Paint shop area: D200, D277, D342, D1101, D1716, D1841, D5709. Traverser area: 26009, 27005, D333, D1510/78/632/50/70/743/8/851/79/906/9, D5714, E3011/44/86. Test area: D397, D1542/59/82/95/710/7, D5275. Old C shop: E3016/45/67/173, D5102/3, D5704. Side of works: D386, D1581, D1853, D5710, 44779, 60007 for restoration, 70051, 71000, 75062. SLS/196609

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/05/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75062
Built at Swindon Works
Tender fitted: BR2A
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
10/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75062    

prev prev