Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 153 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1187 Week
» 23693 Month
» 326883 Year
» 1548448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75063 on 13/06/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 13/06/1957 to Nottingham (16A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/05/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 8 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1027 13/06/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham (New) on 13/06/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
2B Nuneaton w/e 25/05/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 28/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 16A Nottingham on 13/06/1957
NEW 16A Nottingham 4w/e 15/06/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/06/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 28/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
09/07/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). SLS/196208
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Stone Pit) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75063
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Nottingham (16A)
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
28/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75063    

prev prev