Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75065 on 26/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 26/08/1955 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/09/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs , 9 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1029 26/08/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) on 26/08/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 7w/e 23/08/1961
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 17/12/1962
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1955
NEW 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 16/09/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 23/08/1961
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   w/e 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/08/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75065
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Dover Marine (74C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
04/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75065    

prev prev