Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 100 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5321 Week
» 20435 Month
» 323625 Year
» 1545190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75066 on 01/09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Mon 01/09/1955 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal During 02/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1030 01/09/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) on 01/09/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 06/07/1961
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 17/12/1962
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 16/09/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75066
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Dover Marine (74C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75066    

prev prev