Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 121 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5342 Week
» 20456 Month
» 323646 Year
» 1545211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75067 on 12/09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 12/09/1955 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/10/1964
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 9 yrs , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1031 12/09/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) on 12/09/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 7w/e 23/08/1961
75A Brighton 4w/e 17/12/1962
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 19/04/1963
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 16/09/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 04/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 16/09/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 23/08/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 29/04/1963
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 04/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/09/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75067
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Dover Marine (74C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
19/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
04/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 75067    

prev prev