Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 783 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5384 Week
» 16931 Month
» 416613 Year
» 493200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75069   09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1955 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal During 09/1966
Service Life 11 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) 09/1955
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 26/11/1959
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1963
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1955
NEW 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 19/08/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 25/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 75069
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Dover (74C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75069    

prev prev