Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75071 m/e 10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1955 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 11 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) m/e 10/1955
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 6w/e 15/06/1956
82G Templecombe (S&D) 2w/e 17/11/1962
6C Croes Newydd w/e 18/07/1964
5D Stoke w/e 10/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 26/10/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1955
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 2w/e 17/11/1962
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
REINS 91M To London Midland Region w/e 08/07/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 75071
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75071    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Long Marston    

prev prev