Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75072 on 01/11/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Fri 01/11/1955 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Ringwood)
Service Life 10 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1036 01/11/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) on 01/11/1955
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 6w/e 15/06/1956
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction on 01/11/1955
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/11/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75072
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75072    

prev prev