Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 174 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1208 Week
» 23714 Month
» 326904 Year
» 1548469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75074 on 18/11/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 18/11/1955 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at R A Kings (Norwich)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1038 18/11/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) on 18/11/1955
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956
70D Basingstoke 7w/e 08/10/1957
73A Stewarts Lane w/e 11/03/1959
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
70A Nine Elms m/e 14/09/1964
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction on 18/11/1955
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75074
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75074    

prev prev