Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 117 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5338 Week
» 20452 Month
» 323642 Year
» 1545207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75075 on 25/11/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 25/11/1955 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at R A Kings (Norwich)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1039 25/11/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) on 25/11/1955
70D Basingstoke 6w/e 15/06/1956
75E Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 24/09/1962
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction on 25/11/1955
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73E Faversham q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/11/1959 Southern Region floods 4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75075
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75075    

prev prev