Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5381 Week
» 16928 Month
» 416610 Year
» 493197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75079   01/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1956 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal During 11/1966
Service Life 10 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 01/1956
70D Basingstoke 6w/e 15/06/1956
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 20/01/1956
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/01/1956
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   20/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 75079
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75079    

prev