Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 676 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18479 Week
» 71495 Month
» 191022 Year
» 3217875 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7511 |
17/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25161 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/11/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/08/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7511 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25161 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
28/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25161 |
|
|
30/03/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|