Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 652 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19563 Week
» 84517 Month
» 287181 Year
» 3314034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7521 |
07/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25171 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/01/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
11/1978 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
11/1978 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7521 Built at Derby Works Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25171 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/10/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25171 |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
01/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Arbroath Goods Yard |
|
|