Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7522 |
08/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25172 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
08/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
01/02/1981 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs , 24 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/01/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Exceptional headcode modification |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/01/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7522 Built at Derby Works Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25172 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Exceptional headcode modification |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25172 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|