Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1868 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15274 Week
» 68290 Month
» 187817 Year
» 3214670 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7524 |
18/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25174 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/01/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7524 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25174 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
20/09/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25174 |
|
|
06/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|