Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4300 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13874 Week
» 78828 Month
» 281492 Year
» 3308345 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7529 |
12/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25179 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/02/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
09/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7529 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25179 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25179 |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|