Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 192 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17995 Week
» 71011 Month
» 190538 Year
» 3217391 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7531 |
17/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25181 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/02/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
eX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7531 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25181 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/08/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25181 |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Eastleigh MPD |
|
|