Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3601 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17007 Week
» 70023 Month
» 189550 Year
» 3216403 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7534 |
03/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25184 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/03/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
03/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
03/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7534 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25184 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
28/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25184 |
|
|
11/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|