Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2169 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19972 Week
» 72988 Month
» 192515 Year
» 3219368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7538 |
19/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25188 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/03/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7538 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25188 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/08/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25188 |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|