29/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7540 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25190 |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
28/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25190 |
|
|
30/06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|