Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7548 |
20/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25198 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1973 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
04/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
03/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7548 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25198 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
21/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25198 |
|
|
28/02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|