Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 836 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18639 Week
» 71655 Month
» 191182 Year
» 3218035 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7553 |
24/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25203 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/06/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
09/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
09/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
06/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7553 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25203 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25203 |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|