Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1509 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14915 Week
» 67931 Month
» 187458 Year
» 3214311 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7556 |
09/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25206 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/07/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1973 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
05/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7556 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25206 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
21/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25206 |
|
|
21/06/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|