Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2609 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16015 Week
» 69031 Month
» 188558 Year
» 3215411 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7558 |
13/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25208 |
01/09/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/08/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/08/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
18/05/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7558 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
01/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25208 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
06/05/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25208 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
07/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|