Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2156 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19959 Week
» 72975 Month
» 192502 Year
» 3219355 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7562 |
03/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25212 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/12/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
11/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/12/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
11/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
eX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7562 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25212 |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
21/05/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25212 |
|
|
10/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|