Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7567 |
20/01/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25217 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/01/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7567 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25217 |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
30/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25217 |
|
|
01/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|